Senate | 04/26/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | File Number 127 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 140 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |