Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00149 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 149
2-February Session, 2016 *_____SB00149FIN___040116____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 149
2+February Session, 2016 LCO No. 1278
3+ *01278_______FIN*
4+Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
5+Introduced by:
6+(FIN)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 149
10+Raised Bill No. 149
711
812 February Session, 2016
913
10-*_____SB00149FIN___040116____*
14+LCO No. 1278
1115
12-AN ACT CONCERNING AN EXEMPTION FROM THE ADMISSIONS TAX FOR EVENTS AT CONCERT AND ATHLETIC VENUES AND ESTABLISHING A LOCAL OPTION TAX ON SUCH EVENTS.
16+*01278_______FIN*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(FIN)
23+
24+AN ACT CONCERNING AN EXEMPTION FROM THE ADMISSIONS TAX FOR EVENTS AT THE OAKDALE THEATRE.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
16-Section 1. Section 12-541 of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective January 1, 2017):
28+Section 1. Section 12-541 of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2016):
1729
18-(a) There is hereby imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any place of amusement, entertainment or recreation, except that no tax shall be imposed with respect to any admission charge (1) when the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in the case of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not more than five dollars, (2) when a daily admission charge is imposed which entitles the patron to participate in an athletic or sporting activity, (3) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure exclusively to an entity which is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively engages in and assumes the financial risk associated with the presentation of such event, (4) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, which, in the opinion of the commissioner, is conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity which is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided the commissioner is satisfied that the net profit which inures to such entity from such event will exceed the amount of the admissions tax which, but for this subdivision, would be imposed upon the person making such charge to such event, (5) other than for events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, as described in subdivision (d) of section 17a-310, (6) to any production featuring live performances by actors or musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean Beach Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided such theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption from federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code, (7) to any carnival or amusement ride, (8) to any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, (9) if the admission charge would have been subject to tax under the provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 1999, (10) to any event at (A) the XL Center in Hartford, or (B) the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport, [or] (11) from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017, to any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the Ballpark at Harbor Yard in Bridgeport, or (12) to any event at a concert or athletic venue. On and after July 1, 2000, the tax imposed under this section on any motion picture show shall be eight per cent of the admission charge and, on and after July 1, 2001, the tax imposed on any such motion picture show shall be six per cent of such charge.
30+(a) There is hereby imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any place of amusement, entertainment or recreation, except that no tax shall be imposed with respect to any admission charge (1) when the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in the case of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not more than five dollars, (2) when a daily admission charge is imposed which entitles the patron to participate in an athletic or sporting activity, (3) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure exclusively to an entity which is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively engages in and assumes the financial risk associated with the presentation of such event, (4) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, which, in the opinion of the commissioner, is conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity which is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided the commissioner is satisfied that the net profit which inures to such entity from such event will exceed the amount of the admissions tax which, but for this subdivision, would be imposed upon the person making such charge to such event, (5) other than for events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, as described in subdivision (d) of section 17a-310, (6) to any production featuring live performances by actors or musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean Beach Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided such theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption from federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code, (7) to any carnival or amusement ride, (8) to any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, (9) if the admission charge would have been subject to tax under the provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 1999, (10) to any event at (A) the XL Center in Hartford, or (B) the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport, [or] (11) from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017, to any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the Ballpark at Harbor Yard in Bridgeport, or (12) to any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford. On and after July 1, 2000, the tax imposed under this section on any motion picture show shall be eight per cent of the admission charge and, on and after July 1, 2001, the tax imposed on any such motion picture show shall be six per cent of such charge.
1931
2032 (b) The tax shall be imposed upon the person making such charge and reimbursement for the tax shall be collected by such person from the purchase. Such reimbursement, termed "tax", shall be paid by the purchaser to the person making the admission charge. Such tax, when added to the admission charge, shall be a debt from the purchaser to the person making the admission charge and shall be recoverable at law. The amount of tax reimbursement, when so collected, shall be deemed to be a special fund in trust for the state of Connecticut.
21-
22-(c) Any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body, establish by ordinance a tax of up to ten per cent of the admission charge to any event at a concert or athletic venue within such municipality.
2333
2434
2535
2636
2737 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
28-Section 1 January 1, 2017 12-541
38+Section 1 October 1, 2016 12-541
2939
3040 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3141
3242 Section 1
3343
34-January 1, 2017
44+October 1, 2016
3545
3646 12-541
3747
48+Statement of Purpose:
3849
50+To exempt events at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford from the admissions tax.
3951
40-FIN Joint Favorable Subst.
41-
42-FIN
43-
44-Joint Favorable Subst.
52+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]