Senate | 04/21/2016 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | No New File by Committee on Banking | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banking | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | File Number 205 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 168 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |