Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-123
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 518
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3563
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
File Number 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 66
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|