Senate | 04/30/2016 | House Calendar Number 520 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3811 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | File Number 18 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 69 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |