Senate | 05/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Public Act 16-20 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 435 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | File Number 89 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 113 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |