Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | File Number 207 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 184 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |