Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-125
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
House Calendar Number 436
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3915
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Banking
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Banking
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
File Number 54
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 93
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|