Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 498 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | File Number 547 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 354 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |