Senate | 03/29/2016 | File Number 264 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 205 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |