Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00232 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 232
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 754
33 *00754_______ENV*
44 Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
55 Introduced by:
66 (ENV)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 232
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 754
1515
1616 *00754_______ENV*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (ENV)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE RECYCLING OF CONSUMER HOUSEHOLD BATTERIES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 22a-241b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2016):
2929
3030 (a) (1) On or before February 1, 1988, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall adopt regulations in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 designating items that are required to be recycled. The commissioner may designate other items as suitable for recycling and amend such regulations accordingly.
3131
3232 (2) On or before October 1, 2011, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall amend the regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (1) of this subsection to expand the list of designated recyclable items to add (A) containers of three gallons or less made of polyethylene terephthalate plastic and high-density polyethylene plastic, and (B) additional types of paper, including, but not limited to, boxboard, magazines, residential high-grade white paper and colored ledger.
3333
3434 (3) On or before October 1, 2016, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall amend the regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (1) of this subsection to expand the list of designated recyclable items to add consumer household batteries.
3535
3636 (b) Any designated recyclable item shall be recycled by a municipality within six months of the availability of service to such municipality by a regional processing center or local processing system.
3737
3838 (c) Each person who generates solid waste from residential property shall, in accordance with subsection (f) of section 22a-220, separate from other solid waste the items designated for recycling pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of this section.
3939
4040 (d) Every person who generates solid waste from a property other than a residential property shall, in accordance with subsection (f) of section 22a-220, make provision for and cause the separation from other solid waste of the items designated for recycling pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of this section through the use of one or more collection containers for designated recyclable items that are separate from the collection containers for other solid waste. Collection containers that have been used for the collection of solid waste may be converted to containers for the collection of designated recyclable items by labeling or other means to identify that such container is dedicated to collecting designated recyclable items. On and after July 1, 2012, the provisions of this subsection shall also apply to items designated for recycling pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this section. On and after July 1, 2017, the provisions of this subsection shall apply to items designated for recycling pursuant to subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of this section.
4141
4242 (e) No person shall knowingly combine previously segregated designated recyclable items with other solid waste.
4343
4444 (f) For the purposes of this section, "boxboard" means a lightweight paperboard made from a variety of recovered fibers having sufficient folding properties and thickness to be used to manufacture folding or set-up boxes; and "consumer household batteries" means any nonnickel-cadmium battery that weighs two kilograms or less, including, but not limited to, any alkaline, carbon-zinc or lithium metal battery that is used or bought for use primarily for personal, family or household purposes.
4545
4646
4747
4848
4949 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5050 Section 1 October 1, 2016 22a-241b
5151
5252 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5353
5454 Section 1
5555
5656 October 1, 2016
5757
5858 22a-241b
5959
6060 Statement of Purpose:
6161
6262 To add consumer household batteries to the list of designated recyclable items.
6363
6464 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]