Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2016

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016