Senate | 04/11/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | File Number 131 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 135 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |