Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-90
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
House Calendar Number 469
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4419
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 375
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 274
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|