Senate | 04/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 470 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4082 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 507 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 324 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |