Senate | 06/01/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/13/2016 | Public Act 16-76 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 471 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 376 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 263 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |