Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 500
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4945
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
File Number 576
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 363
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/29
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|