Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 377 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 264 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |