Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 527
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5082
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4953
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
File Number 214
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 185
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|