Senate | 04/06/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | File Number 168 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 153 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |