Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00278 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 278
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 1765
33 *01765_______HS_*
44 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
55 Introduced by:
66 (HS)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 278
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 1765
1515
1616 *01765_______HS_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HS)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING NURSING HOME FACILITY MINIMUM STAFFING LEVELS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section, (1) "nursing home facility" means a chronic and convalescent nursing home, and (2) "nursing staff" means registered and licensed practical nurses licensed pursuant to chapter 378 of the general statutes and nurse's aides registered pursuant to chapter 378a of the general statutes.
2929
3030 (b) On and after October 1, 2016, each nursing home facility shall have sufficient nursing staff available on site to maintain a daily minimum staffing ratio of not less than two and three-tenths nursing staff hours per resident.
3131
3232 (c) If any nursing home facility experiences increased costs or expenditures due to compliance with the provisions of this section, the Department of Social Services shall adjust such facility's Medicaid rates and provide payment for any such costs or expenditures within a reasonable period of time and retroactive to the date of such increased costs or expenditures.
3333
3434 (d) The Commissioner of Public Health shall adopt or amend regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to implement the provisions of this section. Such regulations shall include, but need not be limited to, (1) the establishment of a requirement for nursing home facilities to record the number of nursing staff hours available on site to provide direct care to residents, and (2) a definition of the term "direct care".
3535
3636 Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) (a) For purposes of this section: (1) "Full-time" means forty hours per week; (2) "qualified social worker" means a person who holds at least a bachelor's degree in social work from a college or university that was accredited by the Council on Social Work Education at the time of his or her graduation and has at least one year social work experience in a health care facility; (3) "nursing home facility" has the same meaning as provided in section 1 of this act; and (4) "social work designee" means a person with at least an associate's degree in a human services field or anyone employed in a nursing home facility as a social work designee as of January 1, 1989.
3737
3838 (b) Nursing home facilities shall provide the following minimum number of qualified social worker or social work designee hours per week, in the aggregate, for the period commencing with the effective date of this section until September 30, 2020: (1) Ten hours for one to twenty licensed beds; (2) twenty hours for twenty-one to forty licensed beds; (3) thirty hours for forty-one to sixty licensed beds; (4) forty hours for sixty-one to eighty licensed beds; and (5) ten additional hours for every additional twenty licensed beds or fraction thereof over eighty licensed beds.
3939
4040 (c) On and after October 1, 2020, nursing home facilities shall provide the following minimum number of qualified social worker or social work designee hours per week, in the aggregate: (1) Ten hours for every fifteen licensed beds, and (2) one full-time qualified social worker for every sixty licensed beds.
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646 Section 1 from passage New section
4747 Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 New section
4848
4949 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5050
5151 Section 1
5252
5353 from passage
5454
5555 New section
5656
5757 Sec. 2
5858
5959 July 1, 2016
6060
6161 New section
6262
6363 Statement of Purpose:
6464
6565 To ensure sufficient nursing and social work staff is available to provide care to nursing home facility residents.
6666
6767 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]