Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Public Act 16-60
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
House Calendar Number 558
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5698
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
File Number 509
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 334
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|