Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Special Act 16-17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 502
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4051
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
File Number 552
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 348
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|