Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Public Act 16-198
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4929
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 319
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 237
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|