Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Public Act 16-199
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4510
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3823
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 320
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 222
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|