House
|
06/20/2016
|
Veto Overruled, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
House Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Senate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Senate Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Public Act 16-32
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
House Calendar Number 483
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 321
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 223
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|