Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 503
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 4305
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
File Number 677
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 432
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|