Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Public Act 16-201
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
House Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4210
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 436
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 283
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|