Senate | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |