Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Special Act 16-21
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Calendar Number 568
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5648
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 322
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 224
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|