Senate | 05/01/2016 | House Calendar Number 559 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4574 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | File Number 220 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 189 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |