Senate | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | File Number 438 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 286 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |