Senate | 05/04/2016 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | House Calendar Number 580 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5356 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 510 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 341 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |