Senate | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | Public Act 16-174 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | House Calendar Number 535 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | File Number 555 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |