Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00340 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 340
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 1995
3- *_____SB00340GAE___032116____*
3+ *01995_______GAE*
44 Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS
55 Introduced by:
66 (GAE)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 340
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 1995
1515
16-*_____SB00340GAE___032116____*
16+*01995_______GAE*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (GAE)
2323
2424 AN ACT EXTENDING THE TERMS OF CERTAIN MEMBERS OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION COMMISSION.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 1-205 of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
2929
3030 (a) There shall be established, within the Office of Governmental Accountability established under section 1-300, a Freedom of Information Commission consisting of nine members. (1) Five of such members shall be appointed by the Governor, with the advice and consent of either house of the General Assembly. Such members shall serve for terms of four years from July first of the year of their appointment, except that of the members appointed prior to and serving on July 1, 1977, one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1975, one shall serve for a period of four years from July 1, 1975, and one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1977. Of the two new members first appointed by the Governor after July 1, 1977, one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1980, and one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1982. (2) On and after July 1, 2011, four members of the commission shall be appointed as follows: One by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one by the minority leader of the Senate, one by the speaker of the House of Representatives and one by the minority leader of the House of Representatives. Such members, including, but not limited to, members serving on the effective date of this section, shall serve for terms of [two] four years from July first of the year of their appointment. (3) No more than five members of the commission shall be members of the same political party. Any vacancy in the membership of the commission shall be filled by the appointing authority for the unexpired portion of the term.
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3636 Section 1 from passage 1-205(a)
3737
3838 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3939
4040 Section 1
4141
4242 from passage
4343
4444 1-205(a)
4545
46+Statement of Purpose:
4647
48+To extend the terms of members of the Freedom of Information Commission appointed by the legislative leaders from two years to four years.
4749
48-GAE Joint Favorable
49-
50-GAE
51-
52-Joint Favorable
50+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]