Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 506 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4537 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 382 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 266 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |