Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6087
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
House Calendar Number 560
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5592
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
File Number 599
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|