Senate | 05/05/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Public Act 16-5 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | House Calendar Number 404 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 386 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 262 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |