Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Public Act 16-215
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Calendar Number 583
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5885
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 378
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 272
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|