Senate | 04/14/2016 | House Calendar Number 405 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | File Number 330 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 238 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |