Senate | 04/28/2016 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 4551 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 387 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 267 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |