Senate | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | Public Act 16-176 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 485 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | File Number 388 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 268 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |