Senate | 05/02/2016 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 5645 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | File Number 331 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 245 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |