Senate
|
06/10/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Public Act 16-216
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4802
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
File Number 580
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 368
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|