Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Recommitted to Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
File Number 679
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 433
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|