Senate | 04/21/2016 | File Number 690 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 439 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |