Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | File Number 334 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 244 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |