Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 518 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 338 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |