Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 511 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4260 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 520 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 340 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |