Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00425 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 425
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 2532
33 *02532_______PD_*
44 Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
55 Introduced by:
66 (PD)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 425
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 2532
1515
1616 *02532_______PD_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (PD)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING MUNICIPAL TRANSPARENCY, EFFICIENCY AND ACCOUNTABILITY.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2016) (a) There is established a Connect Connecticut grant program for the purpose of creating a citizen relationship management system to (1) enable citizens to communicate with municipal officials, electronically and otherwise, in order to document nonemergency issues in municipalities for resolution, and (2) enable municipalities to monitor, manage and resolve such nonemergency issues and communicate the outcomes of such issues to citizens.
2929
3030 (b) On or before January 15, 2017, in addition to any proposal submitted pursuant to section 2-124s of the general statutes, any municipality may apply to the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management for a Connect Connecticut grant, in the form and manner the secretary prescribes.
3131
3232 (c) Not later than July 1, 2017, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall award Connect Connecticut grants to not more than twenty municipalities from the regional planning incentive account established pursuant to section 4-66k of the general statutes. Not later than July 1, 2018, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall award Connect Connecticut awards to not more than twenty municipalities from the regional planning incentive account established pursuant to section 4-66k of the general statutes. Each Connect Connecticut grant awarded to a municipality shall be for one-half of the cost of implementation of the citizen relationship management system in such municipality or ten thousand dollars, whichever is less. The secretary shall award not more than two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, and not more than two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, for the purpose of implementing the Connect Connecticut grant program. The amount of the grant payable to each municipality under this section during either fiscal year shall be reduced proportionately if the total of such grants exceeds the amount of funds available for such year.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. Section 4-66k of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):
3535
3636 (a) There is established an account to be known as the "regional planning incentive account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management in accordance with subsection (b) of this section for the purposes of first providing funding to regional planning organizations in accordance with the provisions of subsections (b) and (c) of this section, then to providing grants under the Connect Connecticut grant program established pursuant to section 1 of this act, and then to providing grants under the regional performance incentive program established pursuant to section 4-124s.
3737
3838 (b) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed to each regional planning organization, as defined in section 4-124i, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2013, in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars. Any regional council of governments that is comprised of any two or more regional planning organizations that voluntarily consolidate on or before December 31, 2013, shall receive an additional payment in an amount equal to the amount the regional planning organizations would have received if such regional planning organizations had not voluntarily consolidated.
3939
4040 (c) Beginning in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, and annually thereafter, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed to each regional council of governments formed pursuant to section 4-124j, in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars plus fifty cents per capita, using population information from the most recent federal decennial census. Any regional council of governments that is comprised of any two or more regional planning organizations, as defined in section 4-124i, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2013, that voluntarily consolidated on or before December 31, 2013, shall receive a payment in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars for each such regional planning organization that voluntarily consolidated on or before said date.
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646 Section 1 July 1, 2016 New section
4747 Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 4-66k
4848
4949 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5050
5151 Section 1
5252
5353 July 1, 2016
5454
5555 New section
5656
5757 Sec. 2
5858
5959 July 1, 2016
6060
6161 4-66k
6262
6363 Statement of Purpose:
6464
6565 To authorize the Office of Policy and Management to award Connect Connecticut grants to municipalities for the purpose of creating citizen relationship management systems.
6666
6767 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]